IL HB0513 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Gasoline Storage Act. Removes the county population limitation for the issuance of permits for the dispensing or delivery of flammable or combustible motor vehicle fuels directly into the fuel tanks of vehicles from tank trucks, tank wagons, or other portable tanks for sites used for the parking, operation, or maintenance of a commercial vehicle fleet. Effective immediately.
Title
GAS STORAGE ACT-WET FUELING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0299 |
2017-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |