IL HB0511 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Gives non-home rule municipalities the power to exercise all power provided to home rule units under Section 6 of Article VII of the Illinois Constitution, except for the powers to tax, impose fees, and to incur debt. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-NON HOME RULE POWERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6551-1-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback