IL HB0510 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that after the disposition of a criminal case or in any criminal case where a final judgment in the case was not entered due to the death of the defendant, and when a confiscated weapon is no longer needed for evidentiary purposes, and when in due course no legitimate claim has been made for the weapon, a weapon transferred to a law enforcement agency may be sold by the law enforcement agency at public auction under the Law Enforcement Disposition of Property Act. Amends the Domestic Violence: Order of Protection Article of the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 and the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986. Provides that upon expiration of the period of safekeeping of a firearm of a respondent against whom an order of protection was issued, if the firearms or Firearm Owner's Identification Card cannot be returned to respondent because the respondent cannot be located, fails to respond to requests to retrieve the firearms, or is not lawfully eligible to possess a firearm, upon petition from the local law enforcement agency, the court may order the local law enforcement agency to sell the firearm at public auction under the provisions of the Law Enforcement Disposition of Property Act. Amends the Law Enforcement Disposition of Property Act. Provides that weapons that have been confiscated as a result of having been abandoned or illegally possessed may be sold at public auction under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONFIS OF WEAP-LAW ENFORCEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-6Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-14Amended CodeCitation Text
75060214Amended CodeCitation Text
76510302Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback