IL HB0502 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Legal Reserve Life Insurance Article of the Illinois Insurance Code. Removes a provision concerning continuation of coverage during the insured's total disability. Adds provisions requiring extension of coverage for an individual under a group policy during an authorized absence. Defines "authorized absence" to mean an absence that is administratively approved and does not result in a charge to leave of any kind or in loss of basic salary. Sets forth provisions concerning the conditions of the extension of coverage. Provides that the prior insurer shall be liable only to the extent of its extensions of coverage. Includes provisions related to the liability of the succeeding insurer, including regular coverage, temporary coverage, deductible and waiting periods, and determinations of the prior insurer's coverage. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS-COVERAGE EXTENSION-ABSENCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 009-007-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Insurance: Health & Life Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance: Health & Life Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155231.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2155231.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback