IL HB0498 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the State Department of Public Health is not authorized to adopt or enforce rules that mandate Department-led reviews to establish compliance with the Local Health Protection Grant rules for local health departments that satisfactorily submit the required Local Health Protection Grant quarterly indicator data for the programs funded by that grant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL HEALTH DEPTS-GRANT RULES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-25002Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback