IL HB0494 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that the provisions of the Act prohibiting the possession and consumption of alcoholic liquor by a person under 21 years of age and dispensing of alcoholic liquor to a person under 21 years of age do not apply if the person under 21 years of age (1) is on premises where a restaurant is operated and the sale of alcoholic liquor is not the principal business carried out on those premises and (2) is under the direct supervision and approval of his or her parents or parent or those persons standing in loco parentis of the person under 21 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-UNDER 21 AT RESTAURANTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-26HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 007-001-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 008-000-000
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
2017-02-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23556-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback