IL HB0490 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the transportation of pupils.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 88 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 88 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 88 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0361 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 088-029-000 |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 088-029-000 |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Higher Education Committee |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Higher Education Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2013-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-003-000 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-034-000 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-04-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-04-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-03-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 29-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |