IL HB0489 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Re-assigned to State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that December 3rd of each year is designated as Illinois Statehood Day, to be observed throughout the State as a day to commemorate December 3, 1818 as the day Illinois became the 21st State to join the Union. Provides that each year, within 10 days before Illinois Statehood Day, the Governor shall issue a proclamation announcing the recognition of Statehood Day, and designate the official events that shall be held in honor of Illinois obtaining statehood on December 3, 1818.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLINOIS STATEHOOD DAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25SenateRe-assigned to State Government
2017-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-22SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-02-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-004-000
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-01-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5490195New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback