IL HB0488 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $125,000 to the Office of the Lieutenant Governor and $47,500 to the Department of Agriculture. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
$LT GOV & SOS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=488&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/PDF/10000HB0488.pdf |