IL HB0482 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Library District Act. Provides that territory annexed by a public library district included within a municipality or school district shall be approved by ordinance of the board and voter referendum (currently, only by ordinance of the board with the option for a back-door referendum to prevent the annexation). Provides that a petition and referendum for disconnection of annexed territory may occur at any time after the annexation (currently, within 1 year after annexation or 30 days after the date that the first tax bill reflecting the tax levied by the district are sent). Removes a prohibition of more than one petition and referendum for disconnection of the annexed territory. Further provides that any area disconnected by petition and referendum will not be liable for any general obligation bonds of the public library district, or other obligations or liabilities, issued or incurred after a petition for disconnection has been under filed if the referendum for disconnection is approved. Effective immediately.
Title
LIBRARIES-ANNEX AND DISCONNECT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported Back To Counties & Townships Committee; |
2017-03-30 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Counties & Townships Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-03-08 | House | To Consolidated Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 16 | 15-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
75 | 16 | 15-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |