IL HB0479 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teachers Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, when assessing payment for any amount due for earnings increases in excess of 6%, the System shall exclude earnings increases as a result of accepting school-sponsored, extra-curricular assignments. Effective immediately.
Title
TRS-6% EXEMPTN-EXTRA CURRICULR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=479&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0479.htm |