IL HB0477 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Creates the South Suburban Trauma Center Fund. Provides for the construction of a south suburban trauma center. Provides that the Health Facilities Review Board, in consultation with the Department of Public Health, shall select a provider to operate and provide healthcare services to the trauma center. Amends the Emergency Telephone System Act. Provides that from July 1, 2017 through June 30, 2027, all surcharges shall be increased by $0.02 to be deposited into the South Suburban Trauma Center Fund. Extends the repeal date for the Act. Amends the Toll Highway Act. From July 1, 2017 through June 30, 2027, imposes a $1 surcharge at the toll booth known as Plaza 47 to be deposited into the South Suburban Trauma Center Fund. Makes conforming changes to the State Finance Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOUTH SUBURB TRAUMA CTR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20396020New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
5075015.3Amended CodeCitation Text
5075099Amended CodeCitation Text
6051040New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback