IL HB0476 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code and the Public Community College Act. With respect to school boards of school districts and boards of trustees of community college districts, provides that a person may not serve as a board member for more than 2 terms of office that begin on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH BD/COM COL BD-TERM LIMITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-10Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-3Amended CodeCitation Text
105533-2Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-4Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-7Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback