IL HB0475 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Term Limit Referendum Act. Requires the State Board of Elections to cause a statewide advisory public question to be submitted to the voters at the 2018 general election asking whether there should be term limits for State Senators and State Representatives, and whether executive officials should serve no more than 2 consecutive terms of office. Provides that if the provision of the Act conflicts with any other law, the Act controls. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2019. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TERM LIMIT REFERENDUM ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback