IL HB0469 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that vehicles owned and operated by or for a private or public university police department or a private or public college police department, except for motor driven cycles or all-terrain vehicles, shall have permanent vehicle registration plates for a one time fee of $8.00. These registration plates shall contain the designation of "university police" or "college police" and shall be numbered and distributed as prescribed by the Secretary of State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-COLLEGE POLICE PLATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseRemains in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-15HouseMotion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 004-005-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-808.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback