IL HB0456 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Nuclear Safety Preparedness Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFETY-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0125
2019-07-26HouseEffective Date July 26, 2019
2019-07-26HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
2019-04-30SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-04-30SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 030-000-000
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Energy & Environment Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-03-19HouseRe-assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-18HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
42051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback