IL HB0453 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that any taxing district that has an aggregate property tax levy of more than $5,000,000 for the applicable levy year shall make a good faith effort to collect and electronically publish data from all vendors and subcontractors doing business with the taxing district as to whether the vendor or subcontractor is a minority-owned, women-owned, or veteran-owned business or whether the vendor or subcontractor is a small business. Preempts the concurrent exercise of home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PROPERTY TAX-VENDOR REPORT
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] |
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0265 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-014-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-001-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | To Executive- Procurement |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-005-001 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 006-000-002 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-50.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |