IL HB0452 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that, on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the State shall not pay or otherwise make contributions toward the costs of any health or life insurance benefits provided under the Act for retired elected officials under the General Assembly Retirement System. Provides that retired elected officials shall pay the entirety of the cost of coverage under the group life insurance program and the program of health benefits under the Act; provides that the cost of coverage shall be determined by the Director. Provides that nothing in the amendatory Act shall be construed to prevent any retired elected official from receiving health or life insurance benefits under the Act, where that retired elected official contributes the entirety of the cost of coverage. Provides that any retired elected official may waive or terminate coverage in the program of health benefits or group life insurance. Further provides that any retired elected official who has waived or terminated coverage may enroll or re-enroll in the program of health benefits or group life insurance only during the annual benefit choice period, as determined by the Director; except that in the event of termination of coverage due to nonpayment of premiums, the retired elected official may not re-enroll in the program. Makes corresponding changes throughout the Act. Defines "retired elected official". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA-END STATE INS BENEFITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-17HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
537510Amended CodeCitation Text
537510.5New CodeSee Bill Text
53756Amended CodeCitation Text
53757Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback