IL HB0450 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the research and development credit applies on a permanent basis. Provides that the research and development credit applies for all tax years ending on or after December 31, 2004, including, but not limited to, the period beginning on January 1, 2016 and ending on the effective date of the amendatory Act (currently, the credit sunsets on December 31, 2015). Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-R AND D CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] |
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-02-24 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=450&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0450.htm |