IL HB0435 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that it is unlawful for, among other persons, any person appointed to or employed in any of the offices or agencies of State government (rather than any person appointed to or employed in any of the offices or agencies of State government and who receives compensation for such employment in excess of 60% of the salary of the Governor) to have or acquire any contract, or any direct pecuniary interest in any contract, that will be wholly or partially satisfied by the payment of funds appropriated by the General Assembly or in any contract of the Capital Development Board of the Illinois Toll Highway Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PRO CD-CONFLICTS OF INTEREST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseRe-assigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-09HouseRe-assigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-17HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050050-13Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback