IL HB0434 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that August 26th of each year is designated as Illinois Constitution Day, to be observed throughout the State as a day to commemorate August 26, 1818 as the day Illinois ratified its first State Constitution.
Title
ILLINOIS CONSTITUTION DAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0469 |
2017-09-08 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2018 |
2017-09-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-24 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 074-023-000 |
2017-06-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-06-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-06-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-06-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-06-22 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-06-22 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-06-22 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2017-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-003-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Althoff |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2017 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-01-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-01-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |