IL HB0418 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that no person shall knowingly release or cause or organize the release of balloons into the air unless the balloons are (1) used by an institution of higher education or a governmental agency, or pursuant to a governmental contract, for bona fide scientific or meteorological purposes or (2) released indoors and remain indoors. Provides that persons who violate the amendatory Act's provisions shall be subject to a civil penalty of $500 for each offense, and that the release of 50 balloons or fewer at one time is a single offense. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
EPA-BALLOONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-023-001 |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 024-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 028-000-000 |
2021-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |