IL HB0418 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if a person who is receiving a police pension becomes employed as a chief of police, the person must so notify the pension fund paying the pension and any other fund in which the person has service credit, and the pension shall be suspended until the employment as chief terminates; if the person elects to participate in IMRF, the person must also notify IMRF of those police pension funds. Provides that if a person who is receiving a police pension enters service as a police officer with a different municipality, the person must so notify the pension fund paying the pension and the pension shall be suspended until the service terminates, unless the different municipality had a population of less than 6,000 at the time of the return to active service. Applies to persons who first enter service after the effective date of the amendatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-POLICE-RETURN TO SERVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 013-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-004-000
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 012-000-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 011-001-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4053-109.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-124.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback