IL HB0417 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption also applies to persons with a disability. Amends the State Mandates Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SR FREEZE-DISABILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-24HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.28Amended CodeCitation Text
3520015-10Amended CodeCitation Text
3520015-172Amended CodeCitation Text
3520015-175Amended CodeCitation Text
352009-275Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback