IL HB0414 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 014-001-000 |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-03-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner |
2011-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2011-03-07 | House | Re-assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2011-03-04 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |