IL HB0411 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Defines the terms "accident" and "injury". Provides that "injury" includes the aggravation of a pre-existing condition by an accident arising out of and in the course of the employment, but only for so long as the aggravation of the pre-existing condition continues to be the major contributing cause of the disability. Provides that an injury resulting directly or indirectly from idiopathic causes is not compensable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WORKERS COMP-INJURY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-08HouseTo Workers Compensation Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8203051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback