IL HB0409 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 and the Unified Code of Corrections. Permits currently employed and retired State correctional officers to carry their own firearms off duty without being in violation of the unlawful use of weapons and aggravated unlawful use of a weapon statutes if they meet certain training requirements.
Title
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER-FIREARMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Tabled |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Discharge Committee Tabled |
2017-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-02-16 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-02-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=409&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0409.htm |