IL HB0408 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits the offense of unlawful sale or delivery of firearms when he or she knowingly while holding any license as a dealer, importer, manufacturer, or pawnbroker under the federal Gun Control Act of 1968, manufactures, sells, or delivers to any unlicensed person a handgun having a barrel, slide, frame, or receiver which is a die casting of zinc alloy or any other nonhomogeneous metal which will melt or deform at a temperature of less than 700 (rather than 800) degrees Fahrenheit.
Title
CRIM CD-UNLAW FIREARMS-700 DEG
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Tabled |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Discharge Committee Tabled |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-02-16 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=408&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0408.htm |