IL HB0400 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Reinstates the training expense credit for tax years ending on or after December 31, 2017 and prior to December 31, 2027. Increases the amount of the credit from 1.6% of training expenses to 2% of training expenses. Provides that the training expense credit earned on or after December 31, 2017 may be carried forward. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-TRAINING EXPENSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-24HouseTo Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355201Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback