IL HB0399 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning tax credits for providing child care for employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-03HouseSession Sine Die
2014-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2014-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2014
2014-05-15HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000
2013-04-19HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2013-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2013-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2013-02-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2013-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2013-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355210.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback