IL HB0399 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning the Aid to the Aged, Blind or Disabled (AABD) program, eliminates a provision that financial aid for certain refugees or asylees who have become ineligible for federal Supplemental Security Income (SSI) shall be available until July 1, 2009. Provides that financial aid for such refugees or asylees shall be equal to 90% of the standard monthly SSI grant (instead of shall not exceed $500 per month). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-AABD-REFUGEES-ASYLEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-30 Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0022
2009-06-30 Effective Date June 30, 2009
2009-06-30 Governor Approved
2009-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2009-05-19 Passed Both Houses
2009-05-19 Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2009-05-07 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009
2009-05-07 Second Reading
2009-04-22 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2009
2009-04-22 Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
2009-04-15 Assigned to Human Services
2009-03-26 Referred to Assignments
2009-03-26 First Reading
2009-03-26 Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans
2009-03-25 Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009
2009-03-25 Arrive in Senate
2009-03-24 Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
2009-03-24 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-23 Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-23 Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-02-25 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
2009-02-25 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2009-02-25 Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 005-000-000
2009-02-25 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2009-02-25 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
2009-02-09 Assigned to Human Services Committee
2009-02-03 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-02-03 First Reading
2009-02-02 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Osterman

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback