IL HB0398 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that, on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the State shall not pay or otherwise make contributions toward the costs of any health or life insurance benefits provided under the Act for retired elected officials under the General Assembly Retirement System. Provides that retired elected officials shall pay the entirety of the cost of coverage under the group life insurance program and the program of health benefits under the Act; provides that the cost of coverage shall be determined by the Director. Provides that nothing in the amendatory Act shall be construed to prevent any retired elected official from receiving health or life insurance benefits under the Act, where that retired elected official contributes the entirety of the cost of coverage. Provides that any retired elected official may waive or terminate coverage in the program of health benefits or group life insurance. Further provides that any retired elected official who has waived or terminated coverage may enroll or re-enroll in the program of health benefits or group life insurance only during the annual benefit choice period, as determined by the Director; except that in the event of termination of coverage due to nonpayment of premiums, the retired elected official may not re-enroll in the program. Makes corresponding changes throughout the Act. Defines "retired elected official". Effective immediately.
Title
GA-END STATE INS BENEFITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2015-11-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-10-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-09-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-08-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-08-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-06-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-06-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2015-05-18 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-05-18 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-05-18 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 375 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 375 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=398&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0398.htm |