IL HB0396 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Article of the Illinois Vehicle Code concerning size, weight, load, and permits. Creates a new class of weight limits for vehicles with a distance between 8 and 9 feet between the extremes of any group of 2 or more consecutive axles, with a maximum weight of 38,000 pounds on 2 axles and 42,000 pounds on 3 axles. Provides that 2 consecutive sets of tandem axles may carry 34,000 pounds each if the overall distance between the first and last axles of these tandems is 36 feet or more. Deletes language requiring an applicant for a permit for excess size and weight to make certain disclosures relating to whether the applicant is a motor carrier of property. Makes other changes. Provides that the additional fee for certain gross overweight loads is for each additional 45 (instead of 60) miles traveled. Provides that an applicant shall pay $120 (instead of $40) per hour for an engineering inspection or field investigation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-OVERWEIGHT PERMITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0124
2021-07-23HouseEffective Date July 23, 2021
2021-07-23HouseGovernor Approved
2021-06-25HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021
2021-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021
2021-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass Transportation; 019-000-000
2021-05-10SenateAssigned to Transportation
2021-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2021-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2021-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2021-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2021-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625515-107Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-111Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-301Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-307Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-311Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback