IL HB0396 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services may conduct unannounced or announced site visits. Requires the Department to establish, by rule, procedures and criteria for determining whether to conduct an unannounced site visit to an agency, program, or placement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CILA-UNANNOUNCED SITE VISITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Special Needs Services
2017-01-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2101354Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback