IL HB0393 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to the amount paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year for the purpose of purchasing acoustical materials, other materials, labor, and professional services to soundproof a residential home located at an eligible address against aircraft noise generated by an airport governed by the provisions of the Permanent Noise Monitoring Act. Provides that the credit may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero; however, the credit may be carried forward. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-SOUNDPROOFING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=393&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0393.htm |