IL HB0393 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and Fire Protection District Act. Provides that the corporate authorities of municipalities and the boards of trustees of fire protection districts may fix, charge, and collect reasonable fees not exceeding the reasonable cost of services rendered by the municipality or district for emergency action taken in response to a hazardous material emergency incident. Limits charges to a rate not to exceed $250 per hour and not to exceed $70 per hour per firefighter and for reasonable charges to reimburse the municipality or district for extraordinary expenses of materials used in rendering the services. Excludes charges for vehicles, personnel, or equipment that are not actively being used in response to the emergency incident. Amends the Hazardous Material Emergency Response Reimbursement Act making conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE DEPT-HAZARDOUS MATERIALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | To Fire Service Subcommittee |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 55 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-6-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 705 | 11n | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=393&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0393.htm |