IL HB0390 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a credit in an amount equal to 10% of the stipend or salary paid by the taxpayer to up to (i) 5 qualified college interns or (ii) 5 qualified high school interns during the taxable year. Provides that no taxpayer may claim more than $5,000 in total credits under that Section for all taxable years combined. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-INTERNSHIP CREDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-24HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355224New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback