IL HB0388 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that a person is not prohibited from photographing his or her own ballot at any time during the voting process or from viewing a photograph of a completed or partially completed ballot. Provides that a person who gives, promises to give, or receives any money or other valuable consideration in connection with the dissemination or viewing of such a photograph is guilty of a Class 4 felony. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-PHOTOGRAPH BALLOT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-04-27SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-014-000
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000
2017-03-30HouseReported Back To Elections & Campaign Finance Committee;
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-29HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-06HouseTo Ballot Access Subcommittee
2017-02-09HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-01-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-01-17HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-01-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10529-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback