IL HB0385 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Changes the short title to the Riverboat and Casino Gambling Act and changes corresponding references to the Act throughout the statutes. Authorizes license owners to conduct gambling operations on a riverboat or in a land-based casino.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GAMING-CASINO AUTHORIZATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2025052505-305Amended CodeCitation Text
20250539b15.1Amended CodeCitation Text
203015-20Amended CodeCitation Text
20567012.5Amended CodeCitation Text
230101Amended CodeCitation Text
2301011Amended CodeCitation Text
2301011.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2301012Amended CodeCitation Text
2301013Amended CodeCitation Text
2301018Amended CodeCitation Text
2301018.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2301019Amended CodeCitation Text
2301020Amended CodeCitation Text
2301024Amended CodeCitation Text
230103Amended CodeCitation Text
230104Amended CodeCitation Text
230105Amended CodeCitation Text
230105.1Amended CodeCitation Text
230106Amended CodeCitation Text
230107Amended CodeCitation Text
230107.3Amended CodeCitation Text
230107.4Amended CodeCitation Text
230108Amended CodeCitation Text
230109Amended CodeCitation Text
2304025Amended CodeCitation Text
2304045Amended CodeCitation Text
230405Amended CodeCitation Text
2304079Amended CodeCitation Text
2304080Amended CodeCitation Text
230554Amended CodeCitation Text
230554.75Amended CodeCitation Text
23555-1Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-30Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-45Amended CodeCitation Text
305510-17.15Amended CodeCitation Text
4306665Amended CodeCitation Text
7018255.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-3Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-5Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-7Amended CodeCitation Text
8151223-5Amended CodeCitation Text
8154202Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback