IL HB0381 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section granting a Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption, provides that the maximum income limitation is $75,000 for taxable year 2017 and thereafter. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-24HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-08HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-172Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback