IL HB0377 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a municipality, including a home rule unit, may not revoke, suspend, or refuse to renew a business license or otherwise interfere with a business license issued by the municipality to a business owner, including the holder of a retail liquor license issued under the Liquor Control Act of 1934, because the business owner lawfully permits a concealed carry licensee to carry firearms into his or her business establishment. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON CARRY-BUSINESS LICENSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306690Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback