IL HB0375 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that beginning January 1, 2018, all probationary officers employed by law enforcement agencies located in counties of more than 3,000,000 inhabitants, including probationary part-time officers and university police officers, shall be required to complete Crisis Intervention Team (CIT) training as part of initial minimum basic training requirements. All permanent police officers, part-time officers, and university officers must complete at least one Crisis Intervention Team (CIT) training program prior to January 1, 2019. Provides that CIT training includes situations involving domestic violence. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board may partner with local mental health organizations and providers in developing and assisting with crisis intervention programming. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that in counties of more than 3,000,000 inhabitants, $25 of bail moneys retained by the circuit court clerk shall be deposited in the Crisis Intervention Team Training Fund, a special fund in the county treasury, to be used solely for paying for the costs of crisis intervention training for probationary police officers employed by law enforcement agencies located in a county with more than 3,000,000 inhabitants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLICE TRAINING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001
2017-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5070510.17Amended CodeCitation Text
507057Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback