IL HB0374 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that beginning with the 2018 registration year, any individual who has a military-related special license plate issued under certain specified Sections of the Code may reclass his or her special license plate upon acquiring a new specified registration without a replacement fee or registration sticker cost.
Title
VEH CD-WAIVE RECLASS REG FEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0246 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |