IL HB0373 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Local Library Act. Provides that a library board of trustees' statement of financial requirements necessary for the next year and any amount the library board believes will be necessary to levy taxes for the library's next fiscal year shall be submitted to the governing board of the municipality no less than 60 days prior to when the tax levy must be certified under the Property Tax Code (rather than 60 days after the expiration of the fiscal year). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIBRARIES-FINANCIAL REPORTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0245
2017-08-22HouseEffective Date August 22, 2017
2017-08-22HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-15SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7554-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback