IL HB0370 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires each public school and charter school to post (1) the current toll-free telephone number of the Department of Children and Family Services' child abuse hotline; (2) instructions to call 9-1-1 for emergencies; and (3) directions for accessing the Department's website for more information on reporting abuse, neglect, and exploitation. Sets forth other requirements concerning the posting of this information.
Title
SCH CD-CHILD ABUSE HOTLINE
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0468 |
2017-09-08 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2018 |
2017-09-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-24 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 098-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2017-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Charter School Policy Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Charter School Policy Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-23.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |