IL HB0369 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Relocates a provision regarding special immigrant minors from the Abused, Neglected, or Dependent Minors Article to the General Provisions Article. Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that a petition for guardianship of the person of a minor who is 18 years of age or older, but who has not yet attained 21 years of age, may be filed by a parent, relative, or nonrelative person over the age of 21. Provides that a court making determinations concerning such a petition shall consider the best interest of the minor. Provides that an appointed guardian shall have responsibility for the custody, nurture, and tuition of the minor, and shall have the right to determine the minor's residence based on the minor's best interest. Provides that a minor who is the subject of a petition for guardianship or for extension of guardianship may be referred for psychological, educational, medical, or social services under certain circumstances. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
MINORS-JUV CT-PROBATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0259 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2021 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 085-031-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 005-003-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 1-4.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
705 | 405 | 2-4a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11-5.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |