IL HB0365 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall perform annual background checks of all licensees and notify licensees and related EMS System administrators of any convictions by a court of competent jurisdiction of (or entry of a plea of guilty or nolo contendere to) a Class X, Class 1, or Class 2 felony, or an out-of-State equivalent offense. Provides that the Department shall require all medical assisted transport providers to be licensed by the Department and establish staffing, licensing, safety, and training standards. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Includes medical assisted transportation in the definition of "ambulance service". Provides rates of reimbursement and assistance for medical transport services. Amends the State Finance Act. Adds the Medical Assisted Transport Licensure Fund as a special fund. Makes other changes.
Title
MEDICAL ASSISTED TRANSPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.89 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-4.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=365&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0365.htm |