IL HB0363 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that any candidate for an executive branch constitutional office, any member of the General Assembly, any candidate for the General Assembly, any political caucus of the General Assembly, or any political committee on behalf of any of the foregoing may not hold a political fundraising function in Sangamon County on any day the legislature is in session. Removes provision allowing (i) a member of the General Assembly whose legislative or representative district is entirely within Sangamon County or (ii) a candidate for the General Assembly from that legislative or representative district to hold a political fundraising function in Sangamon County on any day the legislature is in session. Removes language specifying the period of time in which fundraising in Sangamon County is prohibited or allowed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVT ETHICS-FUNDRAISING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-02-08HouseTo Constitutional Law Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54305-40Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback