IL HB0362 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Sickle Cell Prevention, Care, and Treatment Program Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to establish a grant program for the prevention, care, and treatment of sickle cell disease and for educational programs concerning the disease. Requires the Department to: (1) develop application criteria and standards of eligibility for groups or organizations that apply for funds under the program; and (2) make available grants to groups and organizations that meet the eligibility standards set by the Department. Provides that the highest priority for grants shall be given to established sickle cell disease community-based organizations, and priority shall be given to ensuring the establishment of sickle cell disease centers in underserved areas with a higher population of sickle cell disease patients. Requires the Department to determine the maximum amount available for each grant; determine policies for the expiration and renewal of grants; require that all grant funds be used for the purpose of prevention, care, and treatment of sickle cell disease or for educational programs concerning the disease; and develop a sickle cell disease educational outreach program that includes the dissemination of educational materials to specified persons and institutions. Permits the Department to contract with an entity to implement the outreach program. Requires the Department to adopt rules. Requires the Department to conduct a study to determine the prevalence, impact, and needs of individuals with sickle cell disease and the sickle cell trait in Illinois. Provides that implementation of the Act is subject to appropriation. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Sickle Cell Chronic Disease Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SICKLE CELL PREVENTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2021-04-23HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 011-002-000
2021-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.935New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback