IL HB0360 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Township Code. Provides that the board of trustees of a township located in DuPage County may submit a proposition to dissolve the township and all road districts wholly within the township to the township electors or township electors may petition for a referendum to dissolve a township. Provides for the transfer of property, assets, personnel, contractual obligations, and liabilities of the dissolving township and road districts to DuPage County. Limits the transferred rights, duties, and funds of the dissolved township to be exercised solely on behalf of the residents within the boundaries of the dissolved township. Provides that municipalities within the dissolving township may elect to assume the duties and responsibilities of a road district or road districts. Limits extensions of specified property tax levies to 90% of the original property tax levy and within the boundaries of the dissolved township. Amends the Election Code and Counties Code making conforming changes. Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that a township in DuPage County shall abolish a road district of that township if the roads of the road district are less than 15 miles in length. Provides that the road district is abolished on the expiration of the term of office of the highway commissioner of the road district facing abolition. Provides for transfer of rights, powers, duties, assets, property, liabilities, obligations, and responsibilities of the road district to the township. Provides that the township board of trustees may enter into a contract with the county, a municipality, or a private contractor to administer the roads added to its jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DUPAGE COUNTY-TWP DISSOLUTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 To Consolidation & Tax Subcommittee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-02-27HouseTo Consolidation & Tax Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10528-7Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1184New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-10New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-15New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-20New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-25New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-30New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-35New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-5New CodeSee Bill Text
601Art. 24 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text
60556-140New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback